NE LB91 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB401 amended into LB91 by AM331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to infant health screenings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to infant health screenings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB401 amended into LB91 by AM331
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-04-11LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST12
2017-04-10LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-10LegislatureHilkemann AM858 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureHilkemann AM858 filed
2017-04-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-03-30LegislatureQuick name added
2017-03-30LegislatureLinehan name added
2017-03-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-30LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM331 adopted
2017-03-30LegislatureWishart name added
2017-03-30LegislatureCraighead name added
2017-03-29LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2017-03-29LegislatureKrist name added
2017-03-29LegislatureMcCollister name added
2017-03-29LegislatureBlood name added
2017-03-29LegislatureHansen name added
2017-03-09LegislatureHilkemann priority bill
2017-02-28LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM331 filed
2017-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM331
2017-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback