NE LB909 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB939 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB939 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to banking and finance
Title
Change provisions relating to banking and finance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Williams AM2544 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2312 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Williams AM2544 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2312 adopted (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB939 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB908 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB854 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB853 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB852 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB764 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST49 |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Williams AM2544 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER172 adopted |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Williams AM2544 filed |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER172 filed |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER172 |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2312 adopted |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2312 pending |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2312 filed |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2312 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |