NE LB904 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions regarding child care reimbursement rates, create the Intergenerational Care Facility Incentive Grant Program, and provide for use of the Medicaid Managed Care Excess Profit Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions regarding child care reimbursement rates, create the Intergenerational Care Facility Incentive Grant Program, and provide for use of the Medicaid Managed Care Excess Profit Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM2734 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Legislature - Wishart AM2775 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2024
2024-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2024-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2024-04-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2024-04-09LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2024-04-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2024-04-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER87 adopted
2024-03-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER87 filed
2024-03-13LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER87
2024-03-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2024-03-05LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2734 adopted
2024-03-05LegislatureBostar AM2858 withdrawn
2024-03-05LegislatureWayne motion to overrule Chair withdrawn
2024-03-05LegislatureChair ruled Bostar AM2858 is germane
2024-03-04LegislaturePassed over
2024-03-04LegislatureBostar AM2858 pending
2024-03-04LegislatureBostar AM2858 to AM2734 filed
2024-03-04LegislatureWishart AM2775 adopted
2024-03-04LegislatureWishart AM2775 to AM2734 filed
2024-03-04LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2734 pending
2024-02-28LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM2734 filed
2024-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2734
2024-02-15LegislatureLegislature's Planning Committee priority bill
2024-02-06LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2024
2024-01-08LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2024-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=54865
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB904.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Final/LB904.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/ER87.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2734.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2858.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM2775.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB904.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB904_20240213-115824.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB904.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB904_20240311-160655.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10206
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10210
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=10211
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=11051

Bill Comments

feedback