NE LB904 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for use of the Water Sustainability Fund for sustainable use of water in food production and transfer General Funds
Title
Provide for use of the Water Sustainability Fund for sustainable use of water in food production and transfer General Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Bolz MO115 prevailed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Bill withdrawn |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Bolz MO115 prevailed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Bolz MO115 Withdraw bill filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |