NE LB9 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change annexation requirements and property tax special valuation provisions
Title
Change annexation requirements and property tax special valuation provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM231 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM231 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-30 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM231 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM231 filed |
2021-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM231 |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2021 |
2021-01-28 | Legislature | Rereferred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |