NE LB9 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit cities, counties, and villages from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology
Title
Prohibit cities, counties, and villages from taxing or regulating distributed ledger technology
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - Legislature - Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |