NE LB895 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change lien and flood-damaged brand provisions relating to motor vehicle certificates of title and change duties and requirements of the Department of Motor Vehicles as prescribed
Title
Change lien and flood-damaged brand provisions relating to motor vehicle certificates of title and change duties and requirements of the Department of Motor Vehicles as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33966 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB895.pdf |