NE LB891 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the distribution of sales tax revenue, school levy limitations, and other tax and school provisions
Title
Change the distribution of sales tax revenue, school levy limitations, and other tax and school provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |