NE LB891 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit discrimination in the provision of services as prescribed under the Psychology Practice Act
Title
Prohibit discrimination in the provision of services as prescribed under the Psychology Practice Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34334 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB891.pdf |