NE LB887 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-23 - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2554 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Nebraska Nonprofit Security Grant Program Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Nebraska Nonprofit Security Grant Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-23LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2554 filed
2024-02-23LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2554
2024-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 01, 2024
2024-01-05LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2024-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback