NE LB885 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Notice of hearing for January 22, 2024
Pending: Legislature Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide requirements for insurance coverage of lung cancer screening

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide requirements for insurance coverage of lung cancer screening

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 22, 2024
2024-01-05LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2024-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback