NE LB884 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Notice of hearing for January 18, 2018
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change and eliminate provisions relating to county sales and use taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and eliminate provisions relating to county sales and use taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 18, 2018
2018-01-09LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2018-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback