NE LB883 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for appointment of independent counsel to prosecute crimes by state officials or employees and change powers and duties of the Attorney General
Title
Provide for appointment of independent counsel to prosecute crimes by state officials or employees and change powers and duties of the Attorney General
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018 (cancel) |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34080 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB883.pdf |