NE LB881 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB881 amended into LB984 by AM2130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB881 amended into LB984 by AM2130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a sales tax exemption for feminine hygiene products and require detention facilities to provide feminine hygiene products to prisoners free of charge
Title
Provide a sales tax exemption for feminine hygiene products and require detention facilities to provide feminine hygiene products to prisoners free of charge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB881 amended into LB984 by AM2130 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |