NE LB880 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB880 amended into LB873 by AM2065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for an early childhood element in a comprehensive plan developed by a city

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for an early childhood element in a comprehensive plan developed by a city

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB880 amended into LB873 by AM2065
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-02-08LegislatureUrban Affairs AM1792 filed
2018-02-08LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1792
2018-01-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2018
2018-01-09LegislatureReferred to Urban Affairs Committee
2018-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback