NE LB88 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB88 by AM705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and the Nurse Licensure Compact and change and eliminate other provisions relating to the regulation of health professionals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact and the Nurse Licensure Compact and change and eliminate other provisions relating to the regulation of health professionals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB88 by AM705
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB343 amended into LB88 by AM810
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB342 amended into LB88 by AM705
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB283 amended into LB88 by AM705
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB61 amended into LB88 by AM705
2017-04-25LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 25, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
2017-04-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST8
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureSchumacher AM864 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureSchumacher AM864 filed
2017-04-03LegislatureBlood AM810 adopted
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER26 adopted
2017-03-31LegislatureBlood AM810 filed
2017-03-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER26 filed
2017-03-28LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER26
2017-03-23LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-23LegislatureRiepe AM705 adopted
2017-03-23LegislatureRiepe AM705 filed
2017-03-23LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM391 adopted
2017-03-01LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM391 filed
2017-03-01LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM391
2017-02-23LegislatureHalloran name added
2017-02-23LegislatureBlood priority bill
2017-02-22LegislatureCrawford name added
2017-02-21LegislatureLinehan name added
2017-02-06LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 15, 2017
2017-01-10LegislatureBrewer name added
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback