NE LB879 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB879 by AM1992
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB879 by AM1992
Summary
Change revenue and taxation provisions
Title
Change revenue and taxation provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB1078 amended into LB879 by AM1992 | |
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB878 amended into LB879 by AM1992 | |
2010-04-06 | Approved by Governor on April 05, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Krist explanation of vote | |
2010-03-30 | Presented to Governor on March 30, 2010 | |
2010-03-30 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-03-30 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 | |
2010-03-30 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-03-17 | Enrollment and Review ER8174 adopted | |
2010-03-01 | Enrollment and Review ER8174 filed | |
2010-03-01 | Placed on Select File with ER8174 | |
2010-02-23 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-02-23 | Cornett AM1992 adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Cornett AM1992 filed | |
2010-02-23 | White AM1998 adopted | |
2010-02-23 | White AM1998 filed | |
2010-02-23 | Revenue AM1798 adopted | |
2010-02-19 | Revenue priority bill | |
2010-02-09 | Revenue AM1798 filed | |
2010-02-09 | Placed on General File with AM1798 | |
2010-01-13 | Notice of hearing for January 21, 2010 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-01-11 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9846 |