NE LB870 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to direct borrowing by cities and villages
Title
Change provisions relating to direct borrowing by cities and villages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Clements AM2613 adopted (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2182 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Clements AM2613 adopted (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM2182 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Clements AM2613 adopted |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Clements AM2613 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2182 adopted |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Clements priority bill |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM2182 filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2182 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |