NE LB87 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine a qualified facility and authorize local distribution utilities to waive certain requirements relating to net metering
Title
Redefine a qualified facility and authorize local distribution utilities to waive certain requirements relating to net metering
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31374 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB87.pdf |