NE LB865A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Wayne AM2858 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |