NE LB865 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for contributions of income tax refunds to accounts established under the Nebraska educational savings plan trust
Title
Provide for contributions of income tax refunds to accounts established under the Nebraska educational savings plan trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Wayne AM2732 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Wayne AM2732 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER187 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER187 |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne AM2732 adopted |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne AM2732 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |