NE LB865 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor on March 17, 2010

Summary

Adopt the Livestock Animal Welfare Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Livestock Animal Welfare Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-17 Approved by Governor on March 17, 2010
2010-03-11 Presented to Governor on March 11, 2010
2010-03-11 President/Speaker signed
2010-03-11 Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2
2010-03-03 Placed on Final Reading
2010-03-02 Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2010-03-02 Fischer AM2078 adopted
2010-03-02 Fischer AM2078 filed
2010-03-02 Enrollment and Review ER8165 adopted
2010-02-25 Enrollment and Review ER8165 filed
2010-02-25 Placed on Select File with ER8165
2010-02-19 Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2010-02-19 Agriculture AM1739 adopted
2010-02-18 Agriculture priority bill
2010-02-04 Agriculture AM1739 filed
2010-02-04 Placed on General File with AM1739
2010-02-03 Price name added
2010-02-01 McCoy name added
2010-01-21 Notice of hearing for February 02, 2010
2010-01-12 Referred to Agriculture Committee
2010-01-11 Coash name added
2010-01-11 Date of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback