NE LB864 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State intent regarding appropriations to the Supreme Court for interpreter services
Title
State intent regarding appropriations to the Supreme Court for interpreter services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2024 |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Bosn name added |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Fredrickson name added |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |