NE LB861 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB861 amended into LB632 by AM2866
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB861 amended into LB632 by AM2866
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Integrated Solid Waste Management Act with respect to consumer merchandise and containers
Title
Change provisions of the Integrated Solid Waste Management Act with respect to consumer merchandise and containers
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB861 amended into LB632 by AM2866 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2672 filed |
2020-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2672 |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40869 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB861.pdf |