NE LB859 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to qualifications and terms of office for certain Game and Parks Commission members
Title
Change provisions relating to qualifications and terms of office for certain Game and Parks Commission members
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40931 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB859.pdf |