NE LB858 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB858 amended into LB843 by AM2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB858 amended into LB843 by AM2075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restrict funding for elections under the Election Act
Title
Restrict funding for elections under the Election Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB858 amended into LB843 by AM2075 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |