NE LB858 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide annual adjustments for total disability income benefits under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Provide annual adjustments for total disability income benefits under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34107 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB858.pdf |