NE LB855 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Placed on General File
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit school districts from taking certain actions relating to outstanding debts on a school lunch or breakfast account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit school districts from taking certain actions relating to outstanding debts on a school lunch or breakfast account

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20LegislaturePlaced on General File
2024-01-24LegislatureHunt name added
2024-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2024
2024-01-05LegislatureReferred to Education Committee
2024-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback