NE LB85 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require Nebraska State Patrol to provide notice of expiration of concealed handgun permits
Title
Require Nebraska State Patrol to provide notice of expiration of concealed handgun permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB85 amended into LB236 by AM1388 |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Clements name added |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |