NE LB848 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB937 amended into LB848 by AM3231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB937 amended into LB848 by AM3231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Rename Columbus Day as Indigenous Peoples' Day and Columbus Day, change the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act as it relates to Indian tribes, and require the display of tribal flags in the Capitol
Title
Rename Columbus Day as Indigenous Peoples' Day and Columbus Day, change the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act as it relates to Indian tribes, and require the display of tribal flags in the Capitol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 35-10-4 (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Groene FA127 lost (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Brewer AM3231 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Brewer AM2723 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2578 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Groene FA127 lost (Y: 6 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2020-07-30 - Legislature - Brewer AM3231 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Brewer AM2723 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2578 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB937 amended into LB848 by AM3231 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB849 amended into LB848 by AM2723 |
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020 |
2020-08-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 35-10-4 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST70 |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Groene FA127 lost |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Groene FA127 filed |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Wayne AM3241 withdrawn |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Brewer AM3231 adopted |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Brewer AM3215 withdrawn |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Brewer AM2751 withdrawn |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER191 adopted |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Wayne AM3241 filed |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Brewer AM3231 filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Brewer AM3215 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER191 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER191 |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Brewer AM2751 filed |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2263 withdrawn |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Brewer AM2723 adopted |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Brewer AM2723 filed |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2578 adopted |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2578 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2578 |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | State-Tribal Relations priority bill |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2263 filed |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |