NE LB841 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB932 amended into LB841 by AM2092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to parole administration and correctional services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to parole administration and correctional services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-1-6 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB932 amended into LB841 by AM2092
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB852 amended into LB841 by AM2092
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB692 amended into LB841 by AM2092
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB366 amended into LB841 by AM2092
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 42-1-6
2018-04-11LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2018-04-06LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-04-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-06LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER171 adopted
2018-04-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER171 filed
2018-04-04LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER171
2018-03-29LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-29LegislatureJudiciary AM2092 adopted
2018-03-29LegislatureChambers MO302 withdrawn
2018-03-27LegislatureChambers MO302 pending
2018-03-27LegislatureChambers MO302 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed
2018-03-27LegislatureGeist AM2697 withdrawn
2018-03-27LegislatureGeist AM2697 filed
2018-03-27LegislatureEbke AM2634 adopted
2018-03-27LegislatureJudiciary AM2092 pending
2018-03-26LegislatureEbke AM2634 filed
2018-02-28LegislatureJudiciary AM2092 filed
2018-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2092
2018-02-20LegislatureJudiciary priority bill
2018-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 17, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback