NE LB835 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for independent audits and reviews under the Nebraska Behavioral Health Services Act
Title
Provide for independent audits and reviews under the Nebraska Behavioral Health Services Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34104 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB835.pdf |