NE LB835 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Health Benefit Exchange Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Health Benefit Exchange Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-06 | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2012 | |
2012-01-17 | Conrad name added | |
2012-01-09 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15581 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB835.pdf |