NE LB827 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB827 amended into LB905 by AM2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB827 amended into LB905 by AM2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Appropriate funds to the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Sen. John Harms [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB827 amended into LB905 by AM2019 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21896 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB827.pdf |