NE LB825 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB825 amended into LB873 by AM2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB825 amended into LB873 by AM2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the taxation of benefits received under the federal Social Security Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the taxation of benefits received under the federal Social Security Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Legislature - Lindstrom MO184 failed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB825 amended into LB873 by AM2649 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Lindstrom MO184 failed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Lindstrom MO184 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Slama MO183 pending |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Slama MO183 Bracket until April 13, 2022 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2588 pending |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Slama FA153 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA152 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2588 pending |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Chair ruled there had not been full and fair debate on AM2588 |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2589 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2591 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2590 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2588 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2514 divided |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Briese AM2514 filed |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1647 withdrawn |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1648 withdrawn |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1649 withdrawn |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-03-22 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. name added |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Jacobson name added |
2022-01-31 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1648 refiled |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1648 withdrawn |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1647 refiled |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne AM1647 withdrawn |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Wayne MO132 withdrawn |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | DeBoer name added |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1649 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1648 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne AM1647 filed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne MO132 pending |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne MO132 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed |
2022-01-21 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Lindstrom priority bill |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |