NE LB820 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change population thresholds for cities of the metropolitan class and cities of the primary class
Title
Change population thresholds for cities of the metropolitan class and cities of the primary class
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-2-5 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM2147 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM2147 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 42-2-5 |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2147 adopted |
2022-03-03 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2147 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2022-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 18, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |