NE LB818 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB927 by AM2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB927 by AM2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change authorized uses of state assistance and certain limitations under the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Title
Change authorized uses of state assistance and certain limitations under the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB927 by AM2023 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |