NE LB816 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for information and training on firearm safety and suicide prevention and place restrictions and requirements on certain transfers of firearms
Title
Provide for information and training on firearm safety and suicide prevention and place restrictions and requirements on certain transfers of firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | McCollister AM2498 filed |
2020-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40943 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB816.pdf |