NE LB814 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 15, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit dismemberment abortion

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit dismemberment abortion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 33-8-8 (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Geist MO231 prevailed (Y: 33 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Hunt MO217 failed (Y: 8 N: 29 NV: 11 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Geist MO225 prevailed (Y: 34 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Legislature - Enrollment and Review ER241 adopted (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Legislature - Hunt MO200 failed (Y: 6 N: 32 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-05 - Legislature - Geist MO216 prevailed (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Geist MO165 prevailed (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on August 15, 2020
2020-08-13LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 13, 2020
2020-08-13LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-13LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 33-8-8
2020-08-13LegislatureGeist MO231 prevailed
2020-08-13LegislatureGeist MO231 Invoke cloture filed
2020-08-13LegislatureHunt MO217 failed
2020-08-13LegislatureErdman MO199 withdrawn
2020-08-13LegislatureAttorney General Opinion 20-009 to Hunt
2020-08-11LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-08-11LegislatureAttorney General Opinion 20-008 to Chambers
2020-08-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-11LegislatureGeist MO225 prevailed
2020-08-11LegislatureGeist MO225 Invoke cloture filed
2020-08-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER241 adopted
2020-08-05LegislatureHunt MO218 Recommit to Judiciary Committee filed
2020-08-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER241 filed
2020-08-05LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER241
2020-08-05LegislatureHunt MO217 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed
2020-08-05LegislatureGeist AM3344 filed
2020-08-05LegislatureGeist AM3345 filed
2020-08-05LegislatureGeist AM3311 filed
2020-08-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-08-05LegislatureHunt MO200 failed
2020-08-05LegislatureGeist MO216 prevailed
2020-08-05LegislatureGeist MO216 Invoke cloture filed
2020-08-05LegislaturePending
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt AM3211 filed
2020-07-29LegislatureErdman MO199 Bracket until July 30, 2020 filed
2020-07-29LegislatureGeist AM3240 filed
2020-07-29LegislatureGeist AM3239 filed
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt MO200 pending
2020-07-29LegislatureHunt MO200 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
2020-07-21LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-07-21LegislatureGeist MO165 prevailed
2020-07-21LegislatureGeist MO165 pending
2020-07-21LegislatureBlood AM3140 filed
2020-07-21LegislatureBlood AM3141 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM3117 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM3116 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM3114 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM2941 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM2956 filed
2020-07-20LegislatureHunt AM2938 filed
2020-03-11LegislatureGeist MO165 Place on General File filed
2020-03-10LegislatureGeist AM2867 filed
2020-02-13LegislatureGeist priority bill
2020-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 20, 2020
2020-01-13LegislatureDorn name added
2020-01-13LegislatureBriese name added
2020-01-10LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-09LegislatureHughes name added
2020-01-09LegislatureLindstrom name added
2020-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41115
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB814.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Final/LB814.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Slip/LB814.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5695
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5929
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5931
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5932
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5954
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=5953
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6054
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6053
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6055

Bill Comments

feedback