NE LB811 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB707 by AM2405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB707 by AM2405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to auctioneers of real estate
Title
Change provisions relating to auctioneers of real estate
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB811 amended into LB707 by AM2405 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 31, 2022 |
2022-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-06 | Legislature | Date of introduction |