NE LB810 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-19 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of State Tort Claims Act relating to certain claims arising out of misrepresentation or deceit by the Department of Health and Human Services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of State Tort Claims Act relating to certain claims arising out of misrepresentation or deceit by the Department of Health and Human Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-19LegislatureBill withdrawn
2018-01-19LegislatureHarr MO169 prevailed
2018-01-17LegislatureHarr MO169 Withdraw bill filed
2018-01-17LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2018 (cancel)
2018-01-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 25, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback