NE LB81 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to special stops at railroad grade crossings under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Title
Change provisions relating to special stops at railroad grade crossings under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM73 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM73 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM73 adopted |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM73 filed |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM73 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |