NE LB81 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change the application fee for handgun certificates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change the application fee for handgun certificates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-09LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-09LegislatureLarson MO158 prevailed
2018-01-09LegislatureLarson MO158 Indefinitely postpone filed
2018-01-09LegislatureWayne AM1520 adopted
2018-01-09LegislatureWayne AM1520 filed
2018-01-09LegislatureChambers MO157 withdrawn
2018-01-09LegislatureChambers MO157 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed
2018-01-09LegislatureErdman FA84 lost
2018-01-09LegislatureErdman FA84 pending
2018-01-09LegislatureErdman FA84 filed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-06LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback