NE LB808A | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Presented to Governor on August 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-12LegislaturePresented to Governor on August 11, 2020
2020-08-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-08-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2020-08-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-08-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-08-03LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2020-07-31LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-07-30LegislaturePlaced on General File
2020-07-30LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback