NE LB808 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to community gardens and seed libraries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to community gardens and seed libraries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-08LegislatureFriesen AM2312 pending
2018-03-08LegislatureFriesen AM2312 filed
2018-03-08LegislatureAgriculture AM1907 lost
2018-02-26LegislatureAgriculture AM1907 filed
2018-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1907
2018-02-20LegislatureAgriculture priority bill
2018-01-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2018-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback