NE LB807A | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriation Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-1-2 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 23, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-1-2
2018-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-04-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-09LegislatureHarr AM2834 adopted
2018-04-06LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2018-04-05LegislatureHarr AM2834 filed
2018-04-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-04-04LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-04-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback