NE LB807 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for replacement of statues in the United States Capitol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for replacement of statues in the United States Capitol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-1-1 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 23, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-1-1
2018-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST65
2018-04-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-09LegislatureHarr AM2831 adopted
2018-04-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER169 adopted
2018-04-05LegislatureHarr AM2831 filed
2018-04-04LegislatureBrewer name added
2018-04-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER169 filed
2018-04-04LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER169
2018-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-04-03LegislatureBrewer AM1863 withdrawn
2018-04-03LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 adopted
2018-03-14LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2392 filed
2018-03-14LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2392
2018-02-20LegislatureState-Tribal Relations priority bill
2018-02-14LegislatureBrewer AM1863 filed
2018-02-14LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureVargas name added
2018-01-08LegislatureBlood name added
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2018-01-04LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback