NE LB806 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt social security benefits and retirement benefits from taxation as prescribed
Title
Exempt social security benefits and retirement benefits from taxation as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2020 |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41012 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB806.pdf |