NE LB803 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change certain permit and certificate requirements relating to prekindergarten programs
Title
Change certain permit and certificate requirements relating to prekindergarten programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 adopted |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER131 filed |
2018-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER131 |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Education AM1719 adopted |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Education AM1719 filed |
2018-02-23 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1719 |
2018-02-21 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |