NE LB802 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB802 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB802 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Nebraska Tourism Commission Promotional Cash Fund and provide for its use
Title
Create the Nebraska Tourism Commission Promotional Cash Fund and provide for its use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB802 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2018 |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34220 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB802.pdf |